Levac, Marie-France (CPSO#: 72476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: Levac, Marie-France Jeanne (used until: 20 Jul 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 941
Akwesasne ON  K6H 5V1
Phone: (613) 8611204
Fax: (888) 465-6620
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M-F. Levac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levac ( CPSO# 72476 )

Business Address:
91 Tweasatani Road
PO Box 41
Akwesasne ON  K6H 5V1
Phone Number: (613) 861-1204

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (613) 861-1204

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 861-1204

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 861-1204

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-FRANCE LEVAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2003