Levesque, Martine (CPSO#: 69379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Action Sport Physio
Centre Leonard da Vinci
8370 boul Lacordaire
St Leonard QC  H1R 3Y6
Phone: (514) 955-8525
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre Hospitalier Fleury
2180 Rue Fleury Est
Montreal QC  H2B 1K3
Canada
Phone: (514) 384-2000
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTINE LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995