Levitan, Robert Daniel (CPSO#: 57352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4289
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34020
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Bauer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Robinson ( CPSO# 62151 )
Dr. R. Levitan ( CPSO# 57352 )
Dr. R. Bauer ( CPSO# 57297 )

Business Address:
Cardiovascular Centre
Main Floor
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 245-1150


Corporation Name: Robert D. Levitan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levitan ( CPSO# 57352 )

Business Address:
Suite 4289
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DANIEL LEVITAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVITAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987