Lewis, Evan Cole (CPSO#: 89200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Neurology Centre of Toronto
491 Eglinton Ave. West
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: 416 860-7554
Fax: (416) 860-7559
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EC Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lewis ( CPSO# 89200 )

Business Address:
Kindercare Pediatrics
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 100
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 860-7554

Business Address:
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 425-6220


Corporation Name: Lewis & Flanders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Flanders ( CPSO# 77729 )
Dr. E. Lewis ( CPSO# 89200 )

Business Address:
Neurology Centre of Toronto
100 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVAN COLE LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2014