Li, Heung-Wing (CPSO#: 32486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jan 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2600 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1T 2M5
Phone: (416) 499-4499
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heung Wing Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Li ( CPSO# 32486 )

Business Address:
682 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1K 2B5
Phone Number: (647) 247-2600

Business Address:
2600 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 2M5
Phone Number: (416) 499-4499

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1981
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Jul 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Oct 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1999
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee Effective: 17 Aug 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 24 Nov 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 24 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)
            As from November 24, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Heung-Wing Li in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Li to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                           DR. HEUNG-WING LI
                                              ("Dr. Li")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Li, certificate of registration number 32486, am a member of the
                  College.  I acknowledge that I was the subject of an Order of the
                  Discipline Committee of the College dated October 2, 2006, as clarified
                  on April 17, 2007 and as modified by the Divisional Court on July 28,
                  2008 (the "Discipline Order"), by which, if I wish to re-enter the
                  general practice of medicine, I am required to successfully complete an
                  approved re-entry program including education, training and supervision.
                  As a result, on November 6, 2008, I entered into an undertaking regarding
                  the terms of a re-entry program (my "2008 Undertaking"). Since the time I
                  entered into my 2008 Undertaking, I have been practising under clinical
                  supervision and have undergone a series of assessments of my practice. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have not successfully completed an approved
                  re-entry program to date, and that the College received information
                  regarding my standard of practice through an assessment conducted as part
                  of my re-entry program. I agree that the present undertaking (my "2017
                  Re-entry Undertaking") replaces my 2008 Undertaking to establish a new
                  framework for my continued participation in a re-entry program. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I shall have clinical encounters with male
                  patients only, in compliance with the Discipline Order. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restriction

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that, as of December 3, 2017, I shall have
                        clinical interactions with no more than five (5) patients per hour,
                        to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except that on one (1) day
                        each week I may have clinical interactions to a maximum of ten (10)
                        hours. 
                  
            (7)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will only engage in the general
                        practice of medicine under the guidance of a clinical supervisor(s)
                        acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor(s)") who has
                        executed the undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A."
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B," with a view to preparing me to 
                              engage in independent unsupervised practice;
                  
                        (ii)  In alternating months, directly observe at least ten (10) of
                              my clinical interactions with patients, for a duration of at
                              least six (6) months;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, at least once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least twenty-five (25) of my patient charts at
                              every meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and
                              direct observations;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; 
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice; 
                  
                        (ix)  Provide a recommendation to the College that my Clinical
                              Supervision be decreased in frequency and/or intensity only
                              if, after at least six (6) months of Clinical Supervision,
                              the Clinical Supervisor(s) is of the view that such a
                              decrease is warranted; and
                  
                        (x)   Decrease the frequency and/or intensity of Clinical
                              Supervision, if recommended by the Clinical Supervisor(s),
                              such a decrease to occur only upon approval of the College,
                              provision of which approval is entirely within the College's
                              discretion.
                  
            (c)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the
                  Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs identified in the
                  IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B," as well as the areas of concern
                  identified in the report(s) of the assessor(s) dated August 2, 2010,
                  January 20, 2013, December 10, 2016, and March 15, 2017, and concerns
                  that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

            (d)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of
                  my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix
                  "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my
                  Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not limited to, any recommended
                  practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

            (e)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is
                  signed and delivered to the College within fifteen (15) days of the date
                  I execute this Undertaking.  

            (f)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in
                  Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to
                  fulfill its provisions, I shall, within fifteen (15) days of receiving
                  notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a
                  similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure
                  that it is delivered to the College within that time. 

            (g)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on
                  the provisions set out under sections 7(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease
                  to engage in the general practice of medicine until such time as I have
                  obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. I acknowledge
                  that in any case, by operation of section 7(a), I will not engage in the
                  general practice of medicine unless I have delivered to the College
                  Appendix "A" signed by a College-approved Clinical Supervisor(s).

            (h)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that if I am required to cease to engage in the
                  general practice of medicine as a result of section 7(g) above this will
                  constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of
                  registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on
                  the public register.

            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that, after approximately nine (9) months of
                        Clinical Supervision under this Undertaking, I will submit to an
                        assessment of my general practice ("the Assessment") by an assessor
                        or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Assessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues, co-workers, and
                        my Clinical Supervisor(s), feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to co-operate fully with the Assessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with
                        the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the Assessment.
                        I also acknowledge that the results of the Assessment will be
                        provided to me and reported to the College and the report may form
                        the basis of further action by the College, including, in the
                        College's discretion, a determination as to whether (i) I have
                        successfully completed the re-entry program, (ii) may continue to
                        participate in the re-entry program, or (iii) may no longer
                        participate in the re-entry program.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to maintain an up-to-date daily log (the
                        "Patient Log") listing every patient seen by me in my general
                        practice each day, including the patient's name, date of birth,
                        OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end time
                        of appointment or visit.  I undertake to maintain the original
                        Patient Log and to send a copy to the College at the end of every
                        calendar month.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                        unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient
                        records, including the Patient Log and daily appointment book(s),
                        by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                        attached hereto as Appendix "C." 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                        a.    I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                              Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                              posted on the Public Register.
                  
                        b.    I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                              being posted in accordance with section 16(a) above, the
                              following summary shall be posted on the Public Register
                              during the time period that this Undertaking remains in
                              effect:
                  
                                    Dr. Li is voluntarily engaging in a program to re-enter
                                    general practice of medicine. As a result:
                  
                                    "As of December 3, 2017, Dr. Li will have clinical
                                    interactions with no more than five (5) patients per
                                    hour, to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except
                                    that on one (1) day each week he may have clinical
                                    interactions to a maximum of ten (10) hours. 
                  
                                    "Dr. Li will maintain an up-to-date daily log listing
                                    every patient seen by him in his general practice each
                                    day, including the patient's name, date of birth, OHIP
                                    number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end
                                    time of appointment or visit.
                  
                                    "Dr. Li will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College. 
                  
                                    "Dr. Li's practice will be assessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College after approximately nine (9)
                                    months of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                                    "In compliance with an order of the Discipline
                                    Committee, Dr Li will have clinical interactions with
                                    male patients only. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors,
                  including Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors under my 2008
                  Undertaking:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice;
                         and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this
                         Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, including Clinical Supervisors and
                  Assessors under my 2008 Undertaking, to disclose to the College, and to
                  one another, any information:

                        (a)   relevant to this Undertaking or my 2008 Undertaking;
                  
                        (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's
                              undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking or
                              the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking under my 2008
                              Undertaking;
                  
                        (c)   relevant to the Assessment or any Assessment conducted under
                              my 2008 Undertaking;
                  
                        (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                              this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                        (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of their duties
                              and which they 
                              reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                              patients.
            (2 of 2)
            As from November 26, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Heung-Wing Li in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Li to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                          DR.  HEUNG-WING LI
                                              ("Dr. Li")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Li, certificate of registration number 32486, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College has received information
                  regarding my standard of practice through an assessment received as part
                  of a process by which I am seeking to re-enter general practice. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.
            (5)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, effective December 3, 2017,
                        which is attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Resignation
                        Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Li, consent to the College sending the Resignation Letter to
                        Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that, as of December 3, 2017, I will not issue
                        new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer
                        any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");                       
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to refer all patients to whom I am prescribing
                        any of the substances described in section (5)(c), above, to other
                        physicians for assessment and care by December 3, 2017.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred to
                        other physicians pursuant to section (5)(d), above (the "Log"). I,
                        Dr. Li, undertake to include in the Log the name of each patient
                        referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the date of
                        referral. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will return any supplies of the substances
                  referred to in section (5)(c) above that are presently in my possession,
                  in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and
                   secure manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12,
                  "Prescribing Drugs."
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (8)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) and in each examination and consulting room, in all my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out at Schedule "E."  For further clarity, this sign
                        shall state as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                          Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has
                                          voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or administer
                                          any of the following: 
                  
                                          -Narcotic Drugs
                                          -Narcotic Preparations
                                          -Controlled Drugs
                                          -Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                          -All other Monitored Drugs
                        
                                          Further information may be found on the College
                                          of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                          www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) and in each
                        examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a
                        clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Schedule "E." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Li, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (8)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (8)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
                  any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar responsibilities,
                  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              The College received information regarding Dr. Li's standard
                              of practice through an assessment conducted as part of the
                              process by which he sought to re-enter general practice. As a
                              result: 
                  
                              Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not
                              to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions
                              for or administer any of the following substances:
                  
                                    (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control
                                          Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                          Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                                    (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                          Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                          Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                                    (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and
                                          Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act,
                                          S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  
                                    (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                          (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                          Substances Regulations made under the Controlled
                                          Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                                    (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the
                                          Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O.
                                          2010, c. 22);        
                  
                                    and as amended from time to time.
                  
                        Dr. Li must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and
                        each examination and
                         consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as
                        follows: 
                  
                                                IMPORTANT NOTICE
                                                
                                                Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has
                                                voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or
                                                administer any of the following: 
                  
                                                -Narcotic Drugs
                                                -Narcotic Preparations
                                                -Controlled Drugs
                                                -Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted
                                                Substances
                                                -All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                                                Further information may be found on the
                                                College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                                                Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient charts by
                  the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate
                  enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution that may have
                  relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

            (19)  I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.


Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jul 2007
Summary:

 On July 30, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Li to have committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee ordered 

1. The Discipline Committee 
 directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Li's certificate of 		registration for a period of three (3) 
 months. The suspension shall be from today, 		July 30 until 12:01 a.m. on October 30, 2007.

2. 
 The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Li to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. The 
 Discipline Committee orders Dr. Li to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within 
 30 days of the date of the order

4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this 
 proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2007


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jan 2006
Summary:

On January 12, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Heung-Wing Li committed acts of professional misconduct in that he 
failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and had engaged in conduct that 
would be regarded by members of the profession as disgraceful, dishonourable and 
unprofessional. 
 
On October 2, 2006 and as clarified on April 17, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered and 
directed that: 
 
1.          Dr. Li shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the fact of the 
reprimand   be recorded on the register. 
 
2.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Li's certificate of registration for a period of twenty four 
            months.  The entire period of the suspension to be itself suspended due to the 
      previous thirty four months that Dr. Li has been excluded from practice. 
 
3.      Dr. Li complete the College's Boundaries Course within the next twelve months at his 
            expense. 
 
 4.         Dr. Li continue in the program of therapy arranged by Dr. X who will provide 
      quarterly   reports to the College until Dr. X recommends, and the Registrar agrees, 
      that treatment is no longer necessary.  Dr. Li shall ensure that Dr. X executes an 
      undertaking acceptable to the College.  If for any reason there is an inability for Dr. X to 
      continue treating Dr. Li, then another psychologist, acceptable to the College, may be 
      substituted. 
  
5.          The Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Li's certificate of 
registration that restricts him to practise as a surgical assistant for at least one year.  During this 
period a physician will be identified in the hospital in which Dr. Li practices who will agree to 
monitor his performance and behaviour, report to the College every six months and execute an 
undertaking acceptable to the College. 
 
6.          After completion of the College's Boundaries Course and successful completion 
      of    therapy with the psychologist, Dr. Li may either continue with a certificate of 
      registration restricted to practise as a surgical assistant or, upon Dr. Li's written request, 
      the Registrar shall impose a permanent term, condition or limitation on his certificate of 
      registration that his general practice is confined to male patients only.  Dr. Li will have 
      been out of such practice for four years and the Committee therefore orders that, before 
      the imposition of the term, condition and restriction on his certificate restricting his 
      practice to male patients only, Dr. Li must comply with the requirements of the Changing 
      Scope of Practice policy of the College and submit a program of re education, training 
      and supervision to the Registrar. The program must be approved by the Registrar and 
      successfully completed before the issuance of a certificate of registration restricted to 
      male patients only. 
  
 
On October 30, 2006, Dr. Li appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional 
Court. 
 
On July 28, 2008, the Divisional Court allowed Dr. Li's appeal regarding the permanent 
restriction that his general practice is confined to male patients only in paragraph 6 of the Order.  
The Divisional Court held that the Discipline Committee has no jurisdiction to order a permanent 
restriction pursuant to its authority under s.51(2)3 to impose a term, condition and limitation for 
a specified or indefinite period of time and, therefore, set aside this aspect of the Committee's 
order. The remainder of the Order is in effect, such that upon Dr. Li's written request, the 
Registrar shall impose a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration that his 
general practice is confined to male patients only, such term, condition or limitation to remain in 
effect unless and until varied by the Discipline Committee. 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 28 Jul 2008
Hearing Date(s): Sep 26, 2005


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Dec 2002
Summary:

 On December 19, 2002:

1.  The Discipline Committee found that Dr. Li committed acts of 
 professional misconduct,

a)	under clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, 
 which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18 (the Code) in 
 that he has sexually abused three female patients; and

b)	under paragraph 27.29 of Ontario 
 Regulation 448/90 made under the Health Disciplines Act, R.S.O. 1980 (O.Reg. 448) in that he 
 engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient.

2.	The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar 
 to revoke Dr. Li's certificate of registration, such revocation to take effect 
 immediately.

3.	The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to attend before this panel to be 
 reprimanded.

4.	The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to post security satisfactory to the 
 College in the amount of $30,000.00, to be held by the College in trust, to guarantee the payment 
 of any amount the College may pay out in respect of funding for therapy and counselling pursuant 
 to section 85.7 of the Code.

5.	The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to pay part of the costs 
 to the College, fixed in the amount of $20,000.00.

6.	The Discipline Committee directs the 
 results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

On January 13, 2003, Dr. Heung-Wing Li 
 filed a notice of appeal to the Division Court, from the findings and decision of the Discipline 
 Committee of December 19, 2002.

On October 1, 2004, the Divisional Court overturned the decision 
 of the Discipline Committee.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 01 Oct 2004
Hearing Date(s): 19 Dec 2002


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Jun 1996
Summary:

In June 1996, Dr. Li pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in that he failed to 
maintain the standard of practice of the profession, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 
448/80, as amended, and s. 29(22) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended.  The Discipline 
Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Li guilty of professional misconduct.   
Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty: 
 
a)  Dr. Li was to appear before this panel of the Committee to be reprimanded on a date to be 
    directed by the panel; 
 
b)  Dr. Li s certificate of registration was to be suspended for a period of three (3) months 
    commencing on July 28, 1996; 
 
c)  During the term of the aforementioned suspension or at the earliest opportunity following 
    the completion of the suspension, Dr. Li was to comply with the following: 
 
    (i)  attend and pay for a mentoring programme on breast health and examinations of up to 
         five days in length with a physician specified by the Discipline Committee who is an 
         expert on breast health and breast disease, and who would design a specialized 
         programme for Dr. Li to address his deficiencies in breast examination; 
 
    (ii) attend and pay for a three-day communications skills course specified by the 
         Discipline Committee; 
 
    (iii) attend and pay for a one-day record-keeping course specified by the Discipline 
         Committee; 
 
    (iv) attend and pay for an assessment at the Physician Review and Enhancement 
         Programme (PREP); and 
 
    (v)  the three courses referred to in items c (i)(ii)(iii) were to have been completed before 
         PREP if practicable. 
 
    (vi) complete all remediation that was identified as being required following completion 
         of the PREP assessment; and 
 
    (vii) make arrangements to have forwarded to either the Registrar of the College of 
         Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario or the Director of Professional Enhancement, or 
         their designates, reports of satisfactory completion of the remedial programmes listed 
         in subparagraphs (i)-(vi) of this section of this Order. 
 
    (viii) there was to be a practice inspection by a College inspector two years after 
         completion of the suspension.  The results of the inspection were to be satisfactory to 
         the Registrar. 
 
In the event that any of the programmes set out in subparagraph (c) was unavailable for any 
reason, Dr. Li was to complete a suitable alternative programme within the Province of Ontario 
to be agreed by Dr. Li and the College, and failing agreement as directed by the Registrar or his 
designate. 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 21, 1996

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 26, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Heung-Wing Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 26, 2017:

The College received information regarding Dr. Li’s standard of practice through an assessment conducted as part of the process by which he sought to re-enter general practice. As a result:

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Li must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:
-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca


Source: Member
Active Date: November 24, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Heung-Wing Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 24, 2017:

Dr. Li is voluntarily engaging in a program to re-enter general practice of medicine. As a result:

As of December 3, 2017, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with no more than five (5) patients per hour, to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except that on one (1) day each week he may have clinical interactions to a maximum of ten (10) hours.

Dr. Li will maintain an up-to-date daily log listing every patient seen by him in his general practice each day, including the patient’s name, date of birth, OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end time of appointment or visit.

Dr. Li will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

Dr. Li’s practice will be assessed by an assessor selected by the College after approximately nine (9) months of Clinical Supervision.

In compliance with an order of the Discipline Committee, Dr Li will have clinical interactions with male patients only.