Li, Qiyu (CPSO#: 79708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harbin Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Q. Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Li ( CPSO# 79708 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QIYU LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008