Liaghati Nasseri, Navid (CPSO#: 79709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:West Azerbaijan Univ. of Med. Sc.&Health, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Dept of Laboratory Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440 Ext. 2454
Fax: (519) 837-6461
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 845-3376
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Navid Liaghati Nasseri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Liaghati Nasseri ( CPSO# 79709 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Lab Medicine
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 13 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVID LIAGHATI NASSERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAGHATI NASSERI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010