Lian, Calvin Tai-Ien (CPSO#: 72686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
R. Faser Elliott Building
Ground Floor
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3947
Fax: (416) 340-5466
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lian ( CPSO# 72686 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
R. Fraser Building - Groud Floor
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3947

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CALVIN TAI-IEN LIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1998
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2013

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Nov 2012
Summary:

 On November 26, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Calvin TaiIen Lian committed an act 
 of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practise. Dr. Lian admitted the allegation. 

Dr. Lian is a family physician 
 practising emergency medicine in Toronto, Ontario.  

On December 22, 2009, Dr. Lian pleaded to 
 and was found guilty of one count of assault under section 266 of the Criminal Code in relation to 
 an assault on his wife. He received a conditional discharge, contingent upon 18 months' probation. 
 Prior to the 2009 assault which is the subject of this proceeding, Dr. Lian pleaded guilty to 
 assault in relation to an assault on his wife in 2002, for which he received an absolute 
 discharge.

Dr. Lian entered into individual and marital counselling in October 2009. 
 
The 
 Committee ordered and directed that: 

(	the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and 
 limitations on Dr. Lian's certificate of registration until the term referred to in paragraph (a) 
 below has been completed:

(a)	Dr. Lian shall participate in and successfully complete an 
 educational program in ethics facilitated by the College, relating to the ethical issues raised by 
 his misconduct, such program to be completed at the earliest opportunity and in any case not later 
 than within six (6) months of the date of this Order, with Dr. Lian to provide proof of successful 
 completion of the program to the College within that time;

(b)	Dr. Lian shall be responsible for 
 any and all costs associated with implementing this term of this Order.

(	Dr. Lian appear before 
 it to be reprimanded.

(	Dr. Lian pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within 
 thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 26, 2012