Liao, Walter Nathan (CPSO#: 91281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310B
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 299-1484
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walter N. Liao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Liao ( CPSO# 91281 )

Business Address:
Suite 310B
4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 299-1484

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER NATHAN LIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014