Lilly, Leslie Blake (CPSO#: 56946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4629
Fax: (416) 340-4041
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.B. Lilly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lilly ( CPSO# 56946 )

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4629

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE BLAKE LILLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LILLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1989