Lim, Siok Ping (CPSO#: 88120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Malay, Mandarin

Education:University of New South Wales, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1440 14th Avenue
Regina SK  S4P 0W5
Phone: (613) 883-8588
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aun-Yeong Chong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lim ( CPSO# 88120 )
Dr. A. Chong ( CPSO# 89458 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7280

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Saskatchewan
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 06 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIOK PING LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Mar 2008 to 02 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Apr 2008 to 02 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 03 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Feb 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 20 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Oct 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2017