Lin, Ken Chien-Horng (CPSO#: 70336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Donnelly-6
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: (416) 864-6014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Chien-Horng Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lin ( CPSO# 70336 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Shuter - 1
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEN CHIEN-HORNG LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2003