Lin, Yulia (CPSO#: 73986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Clinical Pathology
Room B 204
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4042
Fax: (416) 480-6035
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yulia Lin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lin ( CPSO# 73986 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Clinical Pathology
Room B 204
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4042

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Nov 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YULIA LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 02 May 2004 to 28 May 2004
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006