Lindsay, Brian George (CPSO#: 73454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-270 Charlotte St.
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 743-0030
Fax: (705) 743-0047
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Lindsay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lindsay ( CPSO# 73454 )

Business Address:
201 - 270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 743-0030

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN GEORGE LINDSAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LINDSAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001