Lipscombe, Lorraine Lucille (CPSO#: 72347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-6013
Fax: (416) 323-6534
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6013
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cavalcanti Lipscombe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lipscombe ( CPSO# 72347 )
Dr. R. Cavalcanti ( CPSO# 71445 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-6013

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
E W 8 - 420
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6412

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORRAINE LUCILLE LIPSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPSCOMBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002