Litner, Michelle Sima (CPSO#: 76272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Fischbach, Michelle Sima (used until: 22 Jul 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic
8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 0B8
Phone: (905) 709-9709
Fax: (905) 709-9701
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Litner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Litner ( CPSO# 76272 )
Dr. G. Litner ( CPSO# 72582 )

Business Address:
Medical Clinic
8000 Bathurst Street
Suite 2A
Thornhill ON  L4J 0B8
Phone Number: (905) 709-9709

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE SIMA LITNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003