Liu, Cecil (CPSO#: 94501)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CKHA
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cecil Liu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Liu ( CPSO# 94501 )

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CECIL LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2013