Liu, Shiying (CPSO#: 95610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
55 Fruit Street
GRB 8-800
Boston MA  02114
United States
Phone: 617-643-3238
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Liu and Y. Ge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ge ( CPSO# 100231)
Dr. S. Liu ( CPSO# 95610 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHIYING LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2015