Llewellyn, Matthew Evan Michael (CPSO#: 77555)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
294 Main St.
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone: (416) 6992667
Fax: (416) 6998791
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Woodbridge Urgent Care Clinic
Suite 2
4000 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8Z2
Canada
Phone: 905-851-3777
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mississauga Urgent Care Clinic
1500 Dundas Street East (Walmart)
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Canada
Phone: 905-212-1433
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Fax: (416) 741-3542
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Urgent Care Clinic
51 Mountainash Road
Springdale Square, Unit 8
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: 905-799-2722
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Malton Urgent Care Clinic
Unit 110-111
3530 Derry Road East
Mississauga ON  L4T 4E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 672-2273
Fax: 416-750-1500
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Evan Llewellyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Llewellyn ( CPSO# 77555 )

Business Address:
294 Main Street
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 699-2667

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Sep 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW EVAN MICHAEL LLEWELLYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LLEWELLYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2008