Lo, Michael Kwan Kuen (CPSO#: 29337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael K. Lo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: August 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Criminal Charges:

Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.
The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
(1) Sexual exploitation of a young person by directly touching the body of the person with his hand for a sexual purpose, between July 20, 2008 and September 9, 2008, at the Town of Tecumseh, contrary to Section 153(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada;
(2) Sexual assault between July 20, 2008 and September 9, 2008, at the Town of Tecumseh, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: July 24, 2018
Place of charges: London, Ontario
Ontario Provincial Police


Source: Other
Active Date: August 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[July 24, 2018]
1. Notify Essex County OPP – specified officer in writing of any change in his address, employment or occupation.
2. Abstain from communicating directly or indirectly with specified persons or from going to within 250 metres of any known address of specified person and/or any place the person would be known to be such as employment and education.