Lock, Michael Ian (CPSO#: 67799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Radiation Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Lock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lock ( CPSO# 67799 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL IAN LOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1999