Loewith, Rachel Hannah (CPSO#: 91144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

277 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B8
Canada
Phone: 9056287973
Fax: 9066282582
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Loewith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Loewith ( CPSO# 91144 )
Dr. B. Loewith ( CPSO# 58625 )

Business Address:
277 Wilson Street East
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 648-7973


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Rochwerg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Loewith ( CPSO# 91144 )
Dr. B. Rochwerg ( CPSO# 91001 )

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL HANNAH LOEWITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOEWITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012