Loganathan, Mayura (CPSO#: 97882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Fourth Floor PO Box 25
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5159
Fax: (416) 586-3175
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1260 Kennedy Rd #5
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L3
Canada
Phone: 416-285-6111
Fax: 416-285-4883
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loganathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Loganathan ( CPSO# 97882 )

Business Address:
Mt. Sinai Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Fourth Floor PO Box 25
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5159

Business Address:
5-1260 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1P 2L3
Phone Number: (416) 285-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAYURA LOGANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014