Loh, Melissa Shu Fen (CPSO#: 95646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2
Phone: 416-481-1173
Fax: 416-481-7431
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ying and Loh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Ying ( CPSO# 90917 )
Dr. M. Loh ( CPSO# 95646 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2064

Business Address:
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Phone Number: (416) 646-1890

Business Address:
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2J2

Business Address:
491 Church Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA SHU FEN LOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013