Lombard, Theodore Philip (CPSO#: 64466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
184 #6 School Road
Brantford ON  N3T 5L9
Phone: (519) 758-0226
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-5508
Fax: (519) 751-5550
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. P. Lombard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lombard ( CPSO# 64466 )

Business Address:
184 No. 6 Schoold Road
Brantford ON  N3T 5L9

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5508

Business Address:
525 Park Road North
Brantford ON  N3R 7K8
Phone Number: (519) 754-1204

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE PHILIP LOMBARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOMBARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1993