Lombardi, Rocco Anthony (CPSO#: 74795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: 9056233331 Ext. 1311
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 4164382911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3rd Floor, Bldg F
6500 Silver Dart Drive
Mississauga ON  L5P1B4
Canada
Phone: 9056762400
Fax: 9056762011
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. A. Lombardi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lombardi ( CPSO# 74795 )

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
17X - 1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 240-6500

Business Address:
Vista Cargo Centre
Building F, 3rd Floor
6500 Silver Dart Drive
Mississauga ON  L5P 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 676-2400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROCCO ANTHONY LOMBARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOMBARDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2002