Loo, Wei Jing (CPSO#: 84214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DermEffects
1560 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 5L5
Phone: (519) 472-2929
Fax: (519) 472-8484
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N7G 3J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 693-4441
Fax: (519) 693-7084
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wei Jing Loo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Loo ( CPSO# 84214 )

Business Address:
1560 Hyde Park Road
Suite Derm Effects
London ON  N6H 5L5
Phone Number: (519) 472-2929

Business Address:
Four Counties Health Services
1824 Concession Drive
R R 3
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-4441

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 18 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WEI JING LOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 May 2006 to 01 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2006 to 08 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010