Lopes, Laudelino Marques (CPSO#: 92307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Faculdade de Medicina de Valenca, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o London X-Ray Associates
104-450 Central Avenue
London, ON N6B 2E8
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: 519-672-5270 Ext. 7051
Fax: 519-672-4459
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laudelino Lopes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lopes ( CPSO# 92307 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5

Business Address:
Four Counties Health Services
R.R. #3, 1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0

Business Address:
Hanover and District Hospital
90 - 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1

Business Address:
London X-Ray Associates
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2

Business Address:
London X-Ray Associates
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8

Business Address:
London X-Ray Associates
1657 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 3C6

Business Address:
London X-Ray Associates
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H1

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4

Business Address:
Walkerton Hospital
21 McGivern Street West
Box 1300
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0

Business Address:
Kincardine Hospital
43 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6

Business Address:
Chesley Hospital
39-2nd Street S.E.
Chesley ON  N0L 1L0

Business Address:
Durham Hospital
320 College Street
Box 638
Durham ON  N0G 1R0

Business Address:
South Huron Hospital
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9

Business Address:
Listowel Wingham Hospitals Alliance
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5

Business Address:
104 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Laudelino Marques Lopes may practise medicine independently in maternal
            fetal medicine.