Loubani, Mahmoud Mohamed (CPSO#: 66061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maisonville Pediatric
1653 Richmond St
London ON  N6G 2M9
Phone: (519) 850-3800
Fax: (519) 850-5099
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sara & M. Loubani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Loubani ( CPSO# 102412)
Dr. M. Loubani ( CPSO# 66061 )

Business Address:
Maisonville Pediatric
1653 Richmond Street
London ON  N6G 2M9
Phone Number: (519) 850-3800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Mar 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMOUD MOHAMED LOUBANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUBANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013