Louie, Alexander Vincent (CPSO#: 88563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, T-Wing
Room T2-163
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6128
Fax: 416-480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander V Louie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Louie ( CPSO# 88563 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER VINCENT LOUIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOUIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2014