Low, Thomas David Partington (CPSO#: 84392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
I C U Medicine
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 3601
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Low & Stone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stone ( CPSO# 84350 )
Dr. T. Low ( CPSO# 84392 )

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
ICU Medicine and Emergency Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Suite 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K4A 0Z9

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS DAVID PARTINGTON LOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011