Lower, Darlene Patricia (CPSO#: 92937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Sherman Health and Wellness Centre
Suite 300
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darlene P Lower Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lower ( CPSO# 92937 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Sherman Health and Wellness Centre
Suite 300
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (289) 269-1522

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARLENE PATRICIA LOWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOWER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012