Lugomirski, Peter (CPSO#: 92825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: 905-953-7917
Fax: 905-953-0046
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Heart Function Clinic
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Suite 513 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Canada
Phone: 905-895-4521 Ext. 2171
Fax: 905-952-2462
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LUGOMIRSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUGOMIRSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015