Lui, Clementine Janet Pui Man (CPSO#: 92096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hematology, Queen's University
Etherington Hall, Room 2025
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2946
Fax: (613) 533-6855
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lui & Srivastava Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Srivastava ( CPSO# 95358 )
Dr. C. Lui ( CPSO# 92096 )

Business Address:
Queens University
Department of Hematology
Etherington Hall-Room 2025
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2946

Business Address:
Queens University
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall-Room 1018
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2780

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLEMENTINE JANET PUI MAN LUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 21 Sep 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2010 to 19 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2013