Lukowski, Anna Leokadia (CPSO#: 92978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Campus-Internal Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 6674
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Ave
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2600 Ext. 2579
Fax: 416-495-2576
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lukowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lukowski ( CPSO# 92978 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Brichmount Avenue
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]

                  Dr.  Anna  Leokadia  Lukowski  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  Internal Medicine, only.