Luthra, Sanjeev Singh (CPSO#: 79438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Family Health Centre
169 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B3
Phone: (905) 216-0663
Fax: (905) 216-2865
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Paediatric Sickle Cell Clinic
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated
Health and Wellness
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 863-2552
Fax: (905) 863-2468
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Paediatric Sickle Cell Clinic
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated
Health and Wellness
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 863-2552
Fax: (905) 863-2468
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjeev Luthra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Luthra ( CPSO# 79438 )

Business Address:
9 - 10886 Hurontario Street North
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 846-9911

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Suite 102
169 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B3
Phone Number: (905) 216-0663


Corporation Name: Suppal Luthra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )
Dr. S. Luthra ( CPSO# 79438 )

Business Address:
169 Queen Street East
Suite 102
Brampton ON  L6W 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 216-0663

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJEEV SINGH LUTHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUTHRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007