Lynde, Carrie Beatrice (CPSO#: 90834)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lynde Institute For Dermatology
25 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3
Phone: (905) 472-9950
Fax: (905) 472-3366
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kraft & Lynde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lynde ( CPSO# 90834 )
Dr. J. Kraft ( CPSO# 84674 )

Business Address:
25 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3
Phone Number: (905) 472-9950

Business Address:
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 North Court Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-6222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARRIE BEATRICE LYNDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LYNDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 02 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2014