Vance, Marissa Erin (CPSO#: 101038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 949-1908
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Marissa Vance Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARISSA ERIN VANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015