MacDonald, Matthew Hillier (CPSO#: 93684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
Room D
675 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 1M9
Phone: (416) 716-9159
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew H. MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Macdonald ( CPSO# 93684 )

Business Address:
675 King Street West
Suite 310 Room D
Toronto ON  M5V 1M9
Phone Number: (416) 716-9159

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW HILLIER MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2012