MacIntosh, Donald Stuart Lawrence (CPSO#: 71539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5420
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald S. MacIntosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. MacIntosh ( CPSO# 71539 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Mar 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD STUART LAWRENCE MACINTOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACINTOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2000