MacIsaac, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 84679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 650
1600 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 1G3
Phone: (613) 722-4436
Fax: (613) 722-2877
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer MacIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. MacIsaac ( CPSO# 84679 )

Business Address:
1600 Carling Avenue
Suite 650
Ottawa ON  K1Z 1G3
Phone Number: (613) 722-4436

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN MACISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACISAAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2008