MacKenzie, Heather Margaret (CPSO#: 95611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Arthur J. Hobbins Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4080
Fax: 519-685-4081
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather M. MacKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. MacKenzie ( CPSO# 95611 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Department of Physical Medicine & Rehab
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER MARGARET MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016