MacKinnon, Jennifer Ann (CPSO#: 90600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Family Health Team
Suite 207
20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone: (519) 354-2172
Fax: (866) 539-6714
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J&P MacKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mackinnon ( CPSO# 54236 )
Dr. J. MacKinnon ( CPSO# 90600 )

Business Address:
Lakeshore Health Centre
330 Notre Dame Street
Belle River ON  N0R 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 728-0777

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Family Health Team Inc.
Suite 207
20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone Number: (519) 354-2172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011