Macintyre, John Dugald (CPSO#: 28362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: Macintyre, John Douglas (used until: 03 Nov 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkside Medical Clinic
115 Hamilton St. N. Unit 15-B
Waterdown ON  L8B 1A8
Phone: 905-690-1670
Fax: 905-689-9689
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Burlington Independent Physicians
394 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7R 3L4
Canada
Phone: 905-333-1553
Fax: 905-333-1558
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. MacIntyre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macintyre ( CPSO# 28362 )

Business Address:
15-B - 115 Hamilton Street North
Waterdown ON  L8B 1A8
Phone Number: (905) 690-1670

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DUGALD MACINTYRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACINTYRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1988