Madan, Pooja (CPSO#: 95052)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Saint James School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2311 N. Prospect Avenue
Milwaukee WI  53211
United States
Phone: (414) 319-3000
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pooja Madan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Madan ( CPSO# 95052 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Pooja Madan may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.