Magloire, Patrick Morales (CPSO#: 81847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Rm 520 5th Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44252
Fax: (905) 577-1490
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Magloire Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Magloire ( CPSO# 81847 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 22 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Patrick Morales Magloire may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Divisions  of  Cardiology  and  General Internal Medicine, McMaster
                        University, in which Dr. Magloire  holds an academic appointment at
                        the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when Dr. Magloire
                  no longers holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.