Mah, Kandice (CPSO#: 91195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jim Pattison Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics Cardiology
345 3rd Ave S.
Saskatoon SK  S7K 1M6
Phone: 306-931-4887
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kandice Mah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mah ( CPSO# 91195 )

Business Address:
Jim Pattison Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics Cardiology
345 3rd Avenue South
Saskatoon SK  S7K 1M6
Phone Number: (416) 726-8977

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KANDICE MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2015