Mahabir, Vishwanath Kishan (CPSO#: 89334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
215 Delta Park Blvd
Brampton ON  L6T 0H9
Phone: (905) 494-0111
Fax: (905) 4941222
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. K. Mahabir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mahabir ( CPSO# 89334 )

Business Address:
Unit 8
215 Delta Park Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 0H9
Phone Number: (905) 494-0111

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VISHWANATH KISHAN MAHABIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHABIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012