Maharaj, Ashwin Rajan (CPSO#: 67100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1993

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenestone Clinic
Suite 300
5734 Yonge St
North York ON  M2M4E7
Phone: 4162225501
Fax: 4162221932
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

ANCASTER Endoscopy Inc
Suite 205
1144 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON  L9G3K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 304-0062
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

10886 HURONTARIO ST
UNIT 7
Brampton ON  L7A 1E5
Canada
Phone: 905-495-5200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

390 Steele's Avenue West
Units 11/12
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: 9058826566
Fax: 9058826567
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

45 Hannover Drive
Unit 4
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-9999
Fax: (905) 684-9985
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

123 Edward Street
Suite 400
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 416-597-0997
Fax: 416-597-2912
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maharaj Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel ( CPSO# 75554 )
Dr. A. Maharaj ( CPSO# 67100 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 221-7865

Business Address:
1144 Wilson Street West
Suite 205
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9

Business Address:
790 Bay Street
Suite 320
Toronto ON  M5N 1N8

Business Address:
2900 Warden Avenue
Suite 241
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S8

Business Address:
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 100
North York ON  M2K 2W1

Business Address:
4 The Market Place
East York ON  M4C 5M1

Business Address:
2900 Warden Avenue
Suite 241
Scarborough ON  M1W 2S8

Business Address:
45 Hannover Drive
Unit 4
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A3

Business Address:
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Unit 207
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2

Business Address:
10886 Hurontario Street
Suite A-7
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
300 - 5734 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHWIN RAJAN MAHARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)