Mahdavian, Masoud (CPSO#: 94165)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Arak University of Medical Sciences, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (613) 724-1550
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Canada
Phone: (705)734-3943
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahdavian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahdavian ( CPSO# 94165 )

Business Address:
154 LeMarchant Road
St. John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone Number: (613) 724-1550

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (613) 724-1550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MASOUD MAHDAVIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHDAVIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2010 to 14 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2010 to 29 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Apr 2012 to 06 May 2012
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 May 2013 to 02 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015